MD HB1352 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB437

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to electronically transmit certain lists of registered and forfeited businesses to the State Board of Elections in a certain manner and format by January 15 each year; requiring the Department to electronically transmit to the State Board the name of a business in a certain manner and format within 24 hours after processing a filing for revival or reinstatement of the registration of the business; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration Status

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-18SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (97-39)
2021-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-23HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-23HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2021-02-12HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

HB437 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law13304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback