MD HB1351 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a campaign finance entity to initiate the transfer of a contribution made through a third-party payment processor from the account of the third-party payment processor to the designated campaign account of the campaign finance entity within 7 days after the contribution is deposited in the account of the third-party payment processor; repealing the authority of campaign finance entity to pay certain expenses from funds other than a campaign account; authorizing the State Board to impose certain civil penalties; etc.
Title
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor and Payment of Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-20) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {345960/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-23 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2021-02-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1380 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Financial Institutions
Gifts
internet
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privatization
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Funds Transfer
Financial Institutions
Gifts
internet
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privatization
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 13 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |