MD HB1350 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB538
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a treasurer of a campaign finance entity to approve, rather than make, all disbursements for the entity; authorizing the chairman of a campaign finance entity to approve, rather than make, disbursements for the entity under certain circumstances; requiring a campaign finance entity that is liable for a certain civil penalty to submit certain bank statements with the campaign finance entity's campaign finance reports during a certain period; etc.
Title
Campaign Finance - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-35) |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-23 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2021-02-12 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HB538 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Evidence
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Political Committees
Political Parties
Reports
Time
Treasurers
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Evidence
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Political Committees
Political Parties
Reports
Time
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 13 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 604.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |