MD HB135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2023, a food service business from providing certain single-use food or beverage products to a customer ordering carryout or delivery from or dining inside the food service business unless the customer requests or accepts an offer for the single-use products; requiring a food service business to maintain a limited stock of single-use plastic straws for certain customers; and authorizing a food service business to submit a request to a governmental entity for a waiver of up to 3 months.
Title
Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
Sponsors
Del. Sara Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2021-10-04 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Attorney General
Beverage Containers
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Fines
Food
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Beverage Containers
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Fines
Food
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |