MD HB135 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to order a defendant convicted of a charge of animal cruelty under the Act, as a condition of sentencing, to participate in and pay for psychological counseling and to pay, in addition to any other fines and costs, all reasonable costs incurred in removing, housing, treating, or euthanizing an animal confiscated from the defendant; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {252315/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-25HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseReassigned to Judiciary
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback