MD HB1349 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1234
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation to provide a certain bonus to certain public school employees in fiscal year 2024; and requiring the State Department of Education to collect data from each county board of education and Baltimore City on the number of noncertificated education support professionals employed during the 2021-2022 school year and to submit a report on the data by September 15, 2022, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-34) |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {693428/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-22 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2022-02-17 | House | Reassigned to Ways and Means Appropriations |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1349 (Carry Over) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
SB831 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
SB831 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Certifications
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment