MD HB1349 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending to August 1, 2019, the date by which the Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health are required to develop guidelines for public schools regarding health care services to students with sickle cell disease; extending the date to September 1, 2019, for the departments to provide certain technical assistance to schools and develop a process to monitor implementation of guidelines for public schools regarding the administration of health care services to students with sickle cell disease; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 542
2019-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {765164/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-27HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-22HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback