MD HB1347 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the deadline for certain grantees to present certain evidence that a matching fund will be presented; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFloor Amendment {203121/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {689738/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateLaid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {689738/1
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-25SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:45 p.m.
2019-03-25SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-22SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (132-1)
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {954065/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-28HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-22HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1347&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1347f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1347t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1347e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1347_95406501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1347_68973801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1347_20312101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1347.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1347_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0869.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1347_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0989.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1208.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback