MD HB1347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the deadline for certain grantees to present certain evidence that a matching fund will be presented; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; etc.
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Adrienne Jones [D] | Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {203121/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {689738/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {689738/1 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:45 p.m. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2019-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {954065/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Allegany County
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Capital Budgets
Caroline County
Carroll County
Child Care
Community Facilities and Services
Emergency Bills
Environmental Matters
Fire Protection
Forests and Parks
Frederick County
Garrett County
Grants
Harford County
Highways
Historical Matters
Montgomery County
Museums
Parking
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
State Highway Administration
Theaters
Urban Renewal
Washington County
Water
Youth
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Capital Budgets
Caroline County
Carroll County
Child Care
Community Facilities and Services
Emergency Bills
Environmental Matters
Fire Protection
Forests and Parks
Frederick County
Garrett County
Grants
Harford County
Highways
Historical Matters
Montgomery County
Museums
Parking
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
State Highway Administration
Theaters
Urban Renewal
Washington County
Water
Youth