MD HB1347 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a system for adjudication of a claim involving a birth-related neurological injury; providing equitable compensation, on a no-fault basis, for a limited class of catastrophic injuries that result in unusually high costs for custodial care and rehabilitation; establishing the Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund to provide compensation and benefits to eligible claimants; providing for specified premiums and insurance surcharges to be used to finance and administer the Fund; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2017-02-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Malpractice
Nurses
Physicians
Revenue and Taxes
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Health
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Malpractice
Nurses
Physicians
Revenue and Taxes