MD HB1347 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Southern Maryland Higher Education Council; providing for the composition of the Council; requiring the Governor to appoint a chair from among the Council members; prohibiting a member from receiving compensation but entitling a member to reimbursement for specified expenses; providing for the duties of the Council; requiring the Council to submit an interim and a final report on its findings and recommendations on or before specified dates; providing for the termination of the Council; etc.
Title
Southern Maryland Higher Education Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Bohanan) Adopted (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Bohanan) Adopted (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-31 | Hearing 4/5 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-29 | Re-assigned Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-14 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-03-11 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-03-11 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Bohanan) Adopted (136-0) | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Calvert County
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
St. Mary's County
Sunset
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
St. Mary's County
Sunset