MD HB1345 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the scope of the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to include a juvenile services education program in Baltimore City beginning in the 2020-2021 school year; requiring that a certain workgroup convened by the State Department of Education to analyze the results of the Program make concluding findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2020; and extending the termination date for the workgroup to June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Expansion and Alterations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback