MD HB1344 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying standards for involuntary admission of individuals with mental disorders to a certain facility or Veterans' Administration hospital to include consideration that it can be reasonably expected, if not hospitalized, a certain individual presents a danger to the life or safety of the individual or to others; modifying certain standards or emergency evaluations of individuals with mental disorders; and requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to provide certain information to certain schools; etc.
Title
Mental Health Law - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB928 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-23 - Rereferred to Finance
SB928 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-23 - Rereferred to Finance
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Examinations
Health
Hospitals
Injury
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Safety
Veterans
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Examinations
Health
Hospitals
Injury
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Records
Safety
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 622 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 626 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 632 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |