MD HB1343 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Handgun Permit Review Board in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing the process by which a person who is denied a certain handgun permit or renewal of a permit or whose permit is revoked or limited by the Secretary of State Police may appeal the decision to the Office of Administrative Hearings; requiring the Office of Administrative hearings to make a certain annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2019, through January 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-16) (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-47) (Y: 87 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-47) (Y: 87 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-16) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-47) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {282712/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Guns
Hearings
Licenses
Notices
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Review Boards
State Police, Department of
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Guns
Hearings
Licenses
Notices
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Review Boards
State Police, Department of