MD HB1342 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose of the Partnership for Workforce Quality Program and the eligible uses of the grant under the Program to include training for new employees.
Title
Economic Development - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115 |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-23 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2021-02-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Job Training
Partnerships
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor, and Employment
Economic and Community Development
Job Training
Partnerships
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 3 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 3 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 3 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |