MD HB1342 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-19)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the training course that the State Ethics Commission is required to provide for regulated lobbyists and prospective regulated lobbyists; prohibiting a certain State official from unlawfully harassing or discriminating against certain individuals; requiring the Joint Ethics Committee to provide a copy of a certain complaint and notice to the Human Resources Manager of the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Legislative Policy Committee to update a certain antiharassment policy and include a certain provision; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government – Discrimination and Harassment

Sponsors

Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Christopher Adams [R]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Mary Carozza [R]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Bob Flanagan [R]Del. William Frick [D]
Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Robin Grammer [R]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Bob Long [R]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Susan McComas [R]Del. Cory McCray [D]
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Mike Mckay [R]Del. Herbert McMillan [R]Del. Christian Miele [R]
Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Matt Morgan [R]
Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. April Rose [R]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]
Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Meagan Simonaire [R]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {573720/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
2018-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 12:30 p.m.
2018-03-30SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 11:00 a.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {663926/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {583221/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-05HouseHearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1342&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1342f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1342t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1342e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_525_hb1342e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1342_58322101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1342_66392601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1342_57372001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1342.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1342_hru.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0635.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1342_sru.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1246.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1447.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback