MD HB1342 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-19)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require a person who is convicted of specified offenses relating to driving under the influence, a person who refuses a breath alcohol concentration test, or a person who is found to have a blood alcohol concentration level of at least 0.08 but less than 0.15 from a breath alcohol concentration test to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for a specified period; requiring a court to order a person to participate in the Program under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)

Sponsors

Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Christopher Adams [R]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Sen. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Sen. Jill Carter [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. John Cluster [R]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]
Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Peter Hammen [D]
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D]Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Sen. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Susan McComas [R]Sen. Cory McCray [D]Del. Patrick McDonough [R]
Del. Mike Mckay [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Warren Miller [R]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Matt Morgan [R]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]
Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Meagan Simonaire [R]Sen. William Smith [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Sen. Mary Washington [D]Del. Brett Wilson [R]
Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]
Del. Michael Malone [R]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Deb Rey [R]
Sen. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]

Roll Calls

2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {618975/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2016-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-11HouseFloor Committee Amendment {162419/1 Adopted
2016-03-11HouseSpecial Order until later today (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
2016-03-09HouseSpecial Order until 03/11 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
2016-03-08HouseSpecial Order until 03/09 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
2016-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {332410/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-02-24HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-12HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1342?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1342f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1342t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1342_33241001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1342_16241901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1342_61897501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1342.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1342_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1342_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1342,h-0388&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1342,s-1225&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback