MD HB1339 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending from October 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022, the effective date for certain provisions of law that would revise the schedule of basic child support obligations used to calculate the amount of a child support award and make other changes relating to the application of the Maryland Child Support Guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support - Guidelines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-31SenateHearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
2021-03-31SenateHearing canceled
2021-03-23SenateHearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-03-20HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-20HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2021-02-24HouseHearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-23HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-11HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2020(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback