MD HB1336 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission to be a sworn police officer with certain powers; providing that an individual who commences employment as the Executive Director of the State Retirement Agency on or after January 1, 2021, shall have immediate vesting rights in the Employees' Pension System; requiring the State Retirement Agency to submit a report on immediate vesting for certain positions to the Joint Committee on Pensions by December 1, 2021; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 397 |
2021-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-02 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {939637/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {164761/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB761 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Committees and Commissions
Law Enforcement
Public Officials
Retirement
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Tobacco and Nicotine
Work, Labor, and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Committees and Commissions
Law Enforcement
Public Officials
Retirement
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Tobacco and Nicotine
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 1 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 26 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 26 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 26 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |