MD HB1333 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to conduct a study of the participation of minority-owned businesses in the alcoholic beverages industry in the State; providing for the inclusion of certain issues in the study; requiring the Office to conduct the study in consultation and cooperation with certain agencies and interests; requiring the Office to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (132-1)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {233190/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback