MD HB1332 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to offer a commuter plan with unlimited crossings to certain users of the Francis Scott Key Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Plan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
2018-03-06HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback