MD HB1331 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Administrator of Elections to submit a report to the Department of Information Technology and appropriate persons within 7 days after becoming aware of a certain security violation and significant attempted security violation involving an election system; requiring the Department to forward any additional relevant information to the appropriate persons and the State Administrator; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Cybersecurity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {474332/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {765867/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1331&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1331f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1331t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1331e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_524_hb1331e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1331_76586701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb1331_47433201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb1331.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1331_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0511.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1331_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1299.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1452.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback