MD HB133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2023, a person from supplying, selling, or offering for sale a high-PAH sealant product for application to a driveway or parking area in the State; prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2023, a person from applying or soliciting the application of a high-PAH sealant product to a driveway or parking area in the State; establishing a civil penalty up to $2,500 for each violation and an administrative penalty up to $2,500 for each violation, but not exceeding $100,000 total; etc.
Title
Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709 |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-41) |
2022-04-06 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {823027/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-41) |
2022-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {173124/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
2021-09-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB372 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Subjects
Airports
Armed Forces
Commerce and Business
Counties
Courts
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Water
Weights and Measures
Armed Forces
Commerce and Business
Counties
Courts
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |