MD HB133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 68
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain active duty members of the armed services of the United States who are subject to certain deployments from certain mandatory vehicle emissions inspections; requiring all owners of a motor vehicle for which an exemption is sought under the Act to certify in a certain manner that at least one owner of the vehicle has received military orders for deployment outside the United States or to a duty station in a jurisdiction not subject to vehicle emissions control programs; etc.
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 68 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Boundaries
Certifications
Forms
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicle Repair
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Boundaries
Certifications
Forms
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicle Repair
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 23 | 206.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |