MD HB133 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment or a local health department to notify the person at risk, or in the case of a minor, the parent or legal guardian of the person at risk, and the owner of the affected property on receipt of specified blood lead tests under specified circumstances.
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Notification of Elevated Blood Lead Level
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Environment
Environment, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Housing
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Environment
Environment, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Housing
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians