MD HB133 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Pilots in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2022, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2021; and requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, in conjunction with the Board, to make a specified report on or before October 1, 2010.
Title
State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-05 | Third Reading Passed (119-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-01-20 | Hearing 1/28 at 10:30 a.m. | |
2010-01-18 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Pilots and Docking Masters
Reports
Sunset
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Pilots and Docking Masters
Reports
Sunset