MD HB1327 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Body Altering Aesthetics Advisory Committee within the Maryland Department of Health to study whether the current health occupations licensing and certification system adequately regulates the body altering aesthetics industry in the State; and requiring the Advisory Committee to submit interim findings by December 1, 2024, and a final report with any recommended regulatory or legislative changes by December 1, 2025.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Body Altering Aesthetics Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-25) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {913627/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Medical Treatments
meetings
Notices
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Medical Treatments
meetings
Notices
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 5201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 5207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |