MD HB1326 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting from the sales and use tax the sale of custom-made earmolds for artificial hearing devices and any other artificial hearing device-related equipment and parts; and repealing a certain sales and use tax exemption for certain obsolete artificial hearing device-related equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax – Exemption for Artificial Hearing Device Earmolds, Equipment, and Parts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-13SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {345069/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General11211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback