MD HB1325 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a 7-day Class C beer, wine, and liquor license in Howard County; authorizing the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption at the place described in the license; establishing Class C and Class D per diem entertainment venue beer, wine, and liquor licenses; authorizing the license holder to sell beer, wine and liquor on an immediately adjacent licensed premise for consumption on the premises of the holder and the adjacent premises; etc.
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C License and Class C and Class D Per Diem Entertainment Venue Licenses Ho. Co. 20-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {413394/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Fees
Howard County
Rules and Regulations
Stadiums
Theaters
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Fees
Howard County
Rules and Regulations
Stadiums
Theaters
Time