MD HB1320 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the county commissioners of a code county in the Southern Maryland class to adopt rules and regulations for the licensing, maintenance, and operation of towing companies in the county for specified purposes; authorizing the rules and regulations adopted by the county commissioners to require a person who operates a towing company in the county to obtain a license and pay a specified fee; requiring the county commissioners, before adopting regulations, to hold a public hearing that is advertised in advance; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 735
2017-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-10SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-23SenateReassigned to Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2017-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {440119/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1320&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1320f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1320t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_735_hb1320t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1320_44011901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb1320.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1320_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1320_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1320,h-0868&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1320,s-1552&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback