MD HB1320 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date of the Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program in Baltimore City and Baltimore County.
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {962218/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Children, Governor's Office for
Community Facilities and Services
Grants
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Reports
Social Services
Social Workers
Sunset
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Children, Governor's Office for
Community Facilities and Services
Grants
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Reports
Social Services
Social Workers
Sunset