MD HB1320 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 to extend to June 1, 2014, the deadline by which the Board of Directors of the St. Mary's County Fair Association, Inc. must present evidence of a specified matching fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - St. Mary's County - St.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-09 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
2012-02-29 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-27 Re-referred Appropriations
2012-02-16 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback