MD HB132 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, when processing an application for a duplicate license of a victim of a robbery or burglary whose license is taken during the robbery or burglary, to issue the duplicate license free of charge if the victim of the robbery or burglary whose license is taken presents a police report of the incident when applying for a duplicate license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Burglary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {450116/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-23HouseHearing canceled
2018-01-30HouseHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback