MD HB1319 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appoint five members of the Board of License Commissioners for Wicomico County; requiring that members of the Board be nominated in a certain manner; requiring that three members of the Board be residents of the City of Salisbury, nominated jointly by the County Executive and the Mayor of Salisbury; staggering the terms of member of the Board in a certain manner; and specifying the expiration of the terms of certain members of the Board.
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {823796/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Enterprise Zones
Evidence
Fees
Fines
Highways
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Legislation
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Residency
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sheriffs
Special Events
Time
Trials
Weights and Measures
Wicomico County
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Enterprise Zones
Evidence
Fees
Fines
Highways
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Legislation
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Residency
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sheriffs
Special Events
Time
Trials
Weights and Measures
Wicomico County
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 32 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |