MD HB1318 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, for purposes of unemployment insurance law, a certain employing unit to elect to delay submitting a contribution and employment report for calendar quarters ending on March 31, 2021, and March 31, 2022; altering the application of a certain sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain clothing or footwear during a certain sales-tax free period; establishing in calendar year 2021 an 8-day tax free period from the third Sunday in September through the following Sunday for certain restaurant sales of $40 or less; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Business Tax Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment8626(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment8628(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10751(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11105(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11228(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11241(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11242(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11243(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property9266(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback