MD HB1318 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 458
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain place of worship distance restrictions for an alcoholic beverages license in Harford County do not apply to breweries and distilleries; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue a waiver from a restriction barring the issuance of licenses to establishments within 300 feet of a place of worship on a case-by-case basis; requiring public hearings to be held in a certain municipality or county regarding whether the distance restrictions should be waived; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Place of Worship Restrictions – Exemptions and Waivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 458
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (127-3)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {663691/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB377 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages22102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages221602(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback