MD HB1318 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a public service company from terminating electric or gas service to certain residential customers for nonpayment on a day that a government furlough is in effect or for 7 days after the furlough has ended; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring a certain court to stay certain proceedings for the foreclosure or repossession of certain residential property for a certain period of time under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseHearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-03-01HouseRereferred to Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback