MD HB1318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a public service company from terminating electric or gas service to certain residential customers for nonpayment on a day that a government furlough is in effect or for 7 days after the furlough has ended; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring a certain court to stay certain proceedings for the foreclosure or repossession of certain residential property for a certain period of time under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-03-01 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Corporations
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor and Employment
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Unemployment
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor and Employment