MD HB1317 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 1 to 3, the maximum number of apprentice barbers per master barber that a barber shop may employ at the same time; and repealing a limit on the total number of apprentice barbers that a barbershop may employ at the same time.
Title
Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 4 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |