MD HB1316 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a builder of certain new housing units or a builder's agent to provide each buyer or prospective buyer with the option to include on or in a certain garage, carport, or driveway a certain electric vehicle charging station or a dedicated electric line with certain voltage under certain circumstances; requiring a certain builder or builder's agent to give certain buyers and prospective buyers notice of certain options and information about certain rebate programs under certain circumstances; and applying the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Construction - Electric Vehicle Charging

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (115-19)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {180118/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety12205(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback