MD HB1315 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the locations of the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program in the State to include the University of Maryland Baltimore County Training Centers that are located in the State; specifying the amounts and uses of certain grants provided under the Program; altering the date from November 1, 2018 to on or before December 15, 2019, and each December 15 thereafter, that the governing entities must notify the Maryland Higher Education Commission regarding the number of students enrolled in the Program for the academic year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-05SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {394062/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback