MD HB1313 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals under certain circumstances; prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals because of good cause as determined by the Secretary of Human Services; requiring local departments of social services to provide a conciliatory period of 30 days to certain individuals who are not in compliance with the Family Investment Program; requiring 25% of funding be withheld upon certain acts of noncompliance; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
2020-03-17HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (111-23)
2020-03-17HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {197679/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (102-27)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {364661/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB787 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Referred Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services5308(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services5309(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services5310(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services5312(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback