MD HB1312 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Rejected (30-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Judiciary to collect, maintain, and provide certain access to certain information on eviction actions; requiring the Maryland Judiciary to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the eviction data by August 31, 2022, and each year thereafter; establishing that a substantial loss of income due to a declared catastrophic health emergency is an affirmative defense to certain eviction actions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Catastrophic Health Emergencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Rejected (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Floor Amendment 183326/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 51 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-12 - House - Floor Amendment 933629/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 86 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Rejected (30-16)
2021-04-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-12SenateFloor Amendment {373124/1 (Senator Hettleman) Withdrawn
2021-04-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {638776/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-18SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (92-43)
2021-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-12HouseFloor Amendment {183326/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (51-83)
2021-03-12HouseFloor Amendment {933629/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (44-86)
2021-03-11HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {892718/1 Adopted
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-02-09HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB910 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property81001(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property81002(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property81003(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property81004(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8901(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1312?ys=2021RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1312f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1312t.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1312_89271801.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1312_93362901.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1312_18332601.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1312_63877601.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1312_37312401.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1312_jud.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1312_ent.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1312_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0396.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0397.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0499.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1254.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback