MD HB1311 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility criteria for an applicant for a tree expert license to be issued a license.
Title
Natural Resources – Tree Expert License – Eligibility Criteria
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {390815/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB867 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Allegany County
Certifications
Environmental Matters
Garrett County
Insurance
Liability
Natural Resources - Generally
Real Property
Safety
Time
Trees
Work, Labor and Employment
Allegany County
Certifications
Environmental Matters
Garrett County
Insurance
Liability
Natural Resources - Generally
Real Property
Safety
Time
Trees
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 5 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |