MD HB1310 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include certain individuals serving as case management specialist I, II, or III, or a case management specialist supervisor in the Department of Juvenile Services; providing for the calculation of a certain benefit from the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for individuals serving in certain positions on or before June 30, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2020-03-12HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB1004 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions25201(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions25401(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback