MD HB1308 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to which a specified certificate of public convenience and necessity is issued for the construction of a specified overhead transmission line to acquire specified property or rights by condemnation; and applying the Act to the construction of an overhead transmission line for which a certificate of public convenience and necessity is required.
Title
Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-29) (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-29) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {163496/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |