MD HB1308 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a party claiming the right to possession from taking possession or threatening to take possession of specified residential property from a specified protected resident by locking the resident out; requiring a party claiming the right to possession to provide a specified notice in a specified manner under specified circumstances; establishing that specified persons may take possession of residential property from a protected resident only under specified circumstances; providing specified remedies for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {940310/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Attorneys' Fees
Court Costs
Damages
District Courts
Eviction
Foreclosure
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Notices
Real Property
Sheriffs
Utilities
Attorneys' Fees
Court Costs
Damages
District Courts
Eviction
Foreclosure
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Notices
Real Property
Sheriffs
Utilities