MD HB1307 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from requiring a certain pharmacy or pharmacist to obtain certain credentialing as a condition for participating in a certain network with certain frequency or charging a pharmacy or pharmacist a certain fee; repealing certain circumstances under which a pharmacy benefits manager or purchaser is authorized to charge certain fees or hold certain pharmacies responsible for certain reimbursement that the pharmacy benefits manager or purchaser is otherwise prohibited from doing; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Credentialing and Reimbursement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {356185/2 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB1017 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance151628(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance151628.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance151628.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback