MD HB1302 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness; specifying the membership of the Commission; providing for the appointment of a Senate cochair and House cochair of the Commission; providing for the staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving compensation but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study, consider, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; etc.
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {195368/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Excise Tax
Exemptions
Fees
Fuel Tax
Income Tax
Property Tax
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Excise Tax
Exemptions
Fees
Fuel Tax
Income Tax
Property Tax
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous