MD HB1301 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a business that does not want firearms on the business's property to post a clear and conspicuous sign at the main or any secondary entrance of the business at least 24 inches from the edge of the entryway and 4 feet off the ground.
Title
Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Firearms – Business Sign Posting Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Industry and Technology
Signs and Billboards
Commerce and Business
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Guns
Industry and Technology
Signs and Billboards
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 4 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |